MD HB53 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 584
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 584
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a custodian of a public record to provide a copy, printout, or photograph of a public record to an applicant under specified circumstances; authorizing a person or governmental unit that is not provided with a copy, printout, or photograph of a public record to file a complaint with a specified circuit court; authorizing the court to take specified action regarding the failure to provide a copy, printout, or photograph of a public record; etc.
Title
Public Records - Provision of Copies, Printouts, and Photographs - Required
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-20 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (131-0) (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (131-0) (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 584 |
2014-03-27 | House | Returned Passed |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-19 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-02-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (131-0) |
2014-02-13 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-02-13 | House | Favorable with Amendments {756484/1 Report Adopted |
2014-02-11 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2014-01-23 | House | Hearing 1/23 at 2:00 p.m. |
2014-01-08 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2013-07-24 | House | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Attorneys' Fees
Circuit Courts
Court Costs
Disclosure
Inspections
Public Employees
Public Information
Records
State Employees
State Government - Regulations and Procedures
Attorneys' Fees
Circuit Courts
Court Costs
Disclosure
Inspections
Public Employees
Public Information
Records
State Employees
State Government - Regulations and Procedures