MD HB459 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 99
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 99
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Expanding the scope of the Maryland Loan Assistance Repayment Program for Physicians to provide education loan repayments to physician assistants who provide primary care in designated professional shortage areas under specified circumstances; and expanding the definition of "primary care" to include women's health.
Title
Maryland Loan Assistance Repayment Program for Physicians and Physician Assistants
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-09 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-03-09 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 99 |
2014-04-03 | House | Returned Passed |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-03-13 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2014-03-12 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2014-03-11 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-11 | House | Favorable with Amendments {545962/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-10 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2014-03-05 | House | Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-30 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2014-02-12 | House | Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-27 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Education
Education - Miscellaneous
Fees
Health
Health Occupations
Higher Education
Loans
Physician Assistants
Physicians
Women
Education
Education - Miscellaneous
Fees
Health
Health Occupations
Higher Education
Loans
Physician Assistants
Physicians
Women