MD HB445 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-07 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-07 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amending the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2011 to repeal a requirement that the Board of Directors of Loving Arms, Inc. provide a matching fund; specifying the amount of specified grants; providing that a grant for the In Our House Homeless Youth Center may not terminate before June 1, 2015; etc.
Title
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2011 - Baltimore City - In Our House Homeless Youth Center
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-07 | House | Unfavorable Report by Appropriations |
2014-02-18 | House | Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-27 | House | First Reading Appropriations |