MD HB422 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-07 - Special Order until later today (Senator Ramirez) Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-07 - Special Order until later today (Senator Ramirez) Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a dog from being determined to be potentially dangerous based solely on the breed, type, or heritage of the dog; prohibiting a county from enacting a local law and a municipality from adopting an ordinance prohibiting a person from owning, keeping, or harboring a dog of a specified breed, type, or heritage or take specified other actions based on the breed, type, or heritage of the dog; applying the Act prospectively; etc.
Title
Dogs - Discrimination Based on Breed, Type, or Heritage - Prohibited
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (131-2) (Y: 131 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-07 | Senate | Special Order until later today (Senator Ramirez) Adopted |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {758175/1 |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Special Order until later today (Senator Ramirez) Adopted |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {758175/1 |
2014-04-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2014-03-14 | House | Third Reading Passed (131-2) |
2014-03-13 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-13 | House | Favorable with Amendments {172419/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-13 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2014-02-20 | House | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-24 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2014-02-12 | House | Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-24 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Animals
Condominiums
Contracts
Counties
Counties - Local Laws
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Deeds
Discrimination
Eviction
Homeowners Associations
Housing
Landlord and Tenant
Laws and Ordinances
Leases and Rent
Mobile and Manufactured Homes
Municipal Corporations
Nuisances
Real Property
Timesharing
Condominiums
Contracts
Counties
Counties - Local Laws
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Deeds
Discrimination
Eviction
Homeowners Associations
Housing
Landlord and Tenant
Laws and Ordinances
Leases and Rent
Mobile and Manufactured Homes
Municipal Corporations
Nuisances
Real Property
Timesharing