MD HB410 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-14 - Third Reading Failed (69-65)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-14 - Third Reading Failed (69-65)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing a provision of law establishing that a person is not entitled to expungement if the person has been convicted of a crime other than a specified violation or is a defendant in a pending criminal proceeding under specified circumstances.
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Subsequent Conviction or Pending Criminal Proceeding
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Failed (69-65) (Y: 69 N: 65 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - House - House Floor - Motion Tabled (Olszewski) Rejected (58-72) (Y: 58 N: 72 NV: 7 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2014-03-11 - House - House Floor - Motion Tabled (Olszewski) Rejected (58-72) (Y: 58 N: 72 NV: 7 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-14 | House | Third Reading Failed (69-65) |
2014-03-14 | House | Motion vote previous question (Delegate Cane) Adopted |
2014-03-14 | House | Motion Tabled (Delegate Olszewski) Rejected (58-72) |
2014-03-13 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-13 | House | Favorable with Amendments {312014/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-13 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2014-02-11 | House | Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-24 | House | First Reading Judiciary |