MD HB392 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 597
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 597
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the membership of the Northeastern Maryland Higher Education Advisory Board; repealing a provision that requires the Board to ensure that the academic programs and policies of the University Center and sites are in compliance with the policies of the Maryland Higher Education Commission; etc.
Title
Northeastern Maryland Higher Education Advisory Board - Revisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-20 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (121-0) (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (121-0) (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 597 |
2014-03-27 | House | Returned Passed |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-14 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-02-13 | House | Third Reading Passed (121-0) |
2014-02-11 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2014-02-11 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-02-10 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2014-02-04 | House | Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-23 | House | First Reading Appropriations |