MD HB343 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Vetoed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing the requirement that the Chair of the Board of County Commissioners of Allegany County or any county commissioner serve as an ex officio member of the Allegany County Board of Education; repealing the requirement that the Chair or Vice Chair of the Board of County Commissioners of Garrett County serve as an ex officio member of the Garrett County Board of Education; making conforming changes; and making stylistic changes.
Title
Allegany County and Garrett County - Boards of Education - Removal of Ex Officio Member
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | House | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2014-04-03 | House | Returned Passed |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-03-14 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2014-03-13 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2014-03-13 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-12 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2014-02-19 | House | Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-22 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |