MD HB321 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 595
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 595
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the governing body of Frederick County to exempt real property that is owned by an affordable housing land trust but not subject to an affordable housing land trust agreement from the county property tax; etc.
Title
Frederick County - Property Tax - Exemption for Property Owned by Affordable Housing Land Trust
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-19 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (130-0) (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (130-0) (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 595 |
2014-03-26 | House | Returned Passed |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Hearing 3/20 at 1:30 p.m. |
2014-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2014-03-15 | House | Third Reading Passed (130-0) |
2014-03-14 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2014-03-14 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-13 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2014-02-06 | House | Hearing 2/06 at 2:15 p.m. |
2014-01-29 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2014-02-06 | House | Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-22 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Estates and Trusts
Exemptions
Frederick County
Housing
Nonprofit Organizations
Property Tax
Real Property
Taxes - Property - Local
Exemptions
Frederick County
Housing
Nonprofit Organizations
Property Tax
Real Property
Taxes - Property - Local