MD HB309 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-1)
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 114
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-1)
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 114
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a court to issue a permanent final protective order against an individual who is sentenced to serve, instead of who served, a term of imprisonment of at least 5 years for specified crimes and who has served at least 12 months of the sentence; adding the crime of assault in the second degree to the list of crimes, the commission of which subjects an individual to the issuance of a permanent final protective order against the individual in specified circumstances; etc.
Title
Family Law - Domestic Violence - Permanent Final Protective Orders
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-22 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (132-0) (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (132-0) (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-14 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 114 |
2014-04-01 | House | Returned Passed |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2014-03-07 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2014-03-06 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-0) |
2014-03-04 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-04 | House | Favorable with Amendments {952719/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-03 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2014-02-21 | House | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-13 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2014-02-13 | House | Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-21 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Assault
Civil Actions and Procedures
Courts
Domestic Violence
Ex-Offenders
Family Law
Prisoners
Protection Orders
Civil Actions and Procedures
Courts
Domestic Violence
Ex-Offenders
Family Law
Prisoners
Protection Orders