MD HB289 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-07 - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-07 - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a law enforcement agency from using captured plate data unless the agency has a legitimate law enforcement purpose; establishing that information gathered by an automatic license plate reader system is not subject to disclosure under the Maryland Public Information Act; requiring the Department of State Police, in conjunction with the Maryland Coordination and Analysis Center and specified law enforcement agencies, to report annually specified information to the General Assembly on or before March 1; etc.
Title
Automatic License Plate Readers and Captured Plate Data - Authorized Uses
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-30 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-0) (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-07 | Senate | Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings |
2014-04-07 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2014-04-05 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2014-04-05 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-04-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments {292216/1 Report Adopted |
2014-04-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2014-02-04 | House | Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-20 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Auditors and Audits
Disclosure
Electronic Surveillance
Investigations and Inquiries
Law Enforcement
License Plates
Penalties and Sentences
Photography
Privacy
Public Safety
Records
Reports
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
State Police, Department of
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Disclosure
Electronic Surveillance
Investigations and Inquiries
Law Enforcement
License Plates
Penalties and Sentences
Photography
Privacy
Public Safety
Records
Reports
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
State Police, Department of
Telecommunications and Information Technology