MD HB274 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 592
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 592
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a secured party or any other party in interest to file a motion for a deficiency judgment under specified circumstances; requiring a specified motion for deficiency judgment to be filed within 3 years after the final ratification of the auditor's report; etc.
Title
Residential Property - Statute of Limitations for Certain Specialties and Motion for Certain Deficiency Judgments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (102-33) (Y: 102 N: 33 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-22 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (104-31) (Y: 104 N: 31 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-22 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (104-31) (Y: 104 N: 31 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 592 |
2014-04-07 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2014-04-07 | House | Third Reading Passed (102-33) |
2014-04-07 | House | Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Senators Raskin, Muse, and Jacobs |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Conference Committee Appointed |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Senate Refuses to Recede |
2014-04-02 | House | Delegates Niemann, Norman, and Beidle |
2014-04-02 | House | Conference Committee Appointed |
2014-04-02 | House | House Requests Senate Recede |
2014-04-02 | House | House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {178779/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2014-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2014-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (104-31) |
2014-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments {150314/5 Report Adopted |
2014-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters |
2014-02-06 | House | Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-20 | House | First Reading Environmental Matters |
Subjects
Civil Actions
Civil Actions and Procedures
Deeds
Foreclosure
Judgments
Mortgages
Real Property
Security Interests
Statutes of Limitation
Civil Actions and Procedures
Deeds
Foreclosure
Judgments
Mortgages
Real Property
Security Interests
Statutes of Limitation