MD HB270 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 94
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 94
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Adding a new article to the Annotated Code, to be designated and known as the "General Provisions Article", to revise, restate, and recodify the laws of the State relating to rules of interpretation, the form and administration of official oaths, the Open Meetings Act, the Public Information Act, the Maryland Public Ethics Law, acquisition of land by the United States and jurisdiction of the State and United States over specified land, and the State seal, flag, emblems, designations, and commemorative days and months; etc.
Title
General Provisions Article
Sponsors
Del. The Speaker [?] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 94 |
2014-04-03 | House | Returned Passed |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-14 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-03-13 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2014-03-12 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2014-03-12 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-11 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2014-02-25 | House | Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-20 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Age of Majority
Annotated Code of Maryland
Boundaries
Committees and Commissions
Counties
Courts
Disclosure
Education, Boards of
Ethics
Federal Government
Flags
General Assembly
Holidays and Special Dates
Inspections
Jurisdiction
Legislative Services, Department of
Lobbying
Municipal Corporations
Oaths
Political Candidates
Privacy
Public Employees
Public Information
Public Officials
Real Property
Records
Reports
State Employees
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
State Symbols
Time
Age of Majority
Annotated Code of Maryland
Boundaries
Committees and Commissions
Counties
Courts
Disclosure
Education, Boards of
Ethics
Federal Government
Flags
General Assembly
Holidays and Special Dates
Inspections
Jurisdiction
Legislative Services, Department of
Lobbying
Municipal Corporations
Oaths
Political Candidates
Privacy
Public Employees
Public Information
Public Officials
Real Property
Records
Reports
State Employees
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
State Symbols
Time