MD HB238 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 90
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 90
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Amending the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2013 to authorize the matching fund of a grant for the Easton Head Start Center to consist of funds expended prior to June 1, 2013; making the Act an emergency measure; etc.
Title
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2013 - Talbot County - Easton Head Start Center
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-09 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (128-4) (Y: 128 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (128-4) (Y: 128 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 90 |
2014-03-13 | House | Returned Passed |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Hearing 3/05 at 2:30 p.m. |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-21 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2014-02-20 | House | Third Reading Passed (128-4) |
2014-02-18 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2014-02-18 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-02-17 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2014-02-11 | House | Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-17 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Community Facilities and Services
Education
Emergency Bills
Prior Authorizations
State Bonds
Talbot County
Education
Emergency Bills
Prior Authorizations
State Bonds
Talbot County