MD HB223 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-05 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 390
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-05 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 390
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the eligibility criteria for the urban agricultural property tax credit; altering the definition of "urban agricultural property"; and applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after June 30, 2014.
Title
Property Tax Credit - Urban Agricultural Property - Applicability
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (130-0) (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (130-0) (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-05 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 390 |
2014-04-05 | House | Returned Passed |
2014-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2014-03-15 | House | Third Reading Passed (130-0) |
2014-03-14 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments {285368/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2014-02-06 | House | Hearing 2/06 at 2:15 p.m. |
2014-01-17 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |