MD HB198 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-05 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 389
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-05 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 389
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing from 25% to 28% over a 4-year period the percentage of the federal earned income credit used for determining the amount that an individual may claim as a refundable credit under the Maryland earned income credit.
Title
Income Tax - Earned Income Credit - Refundable Amount
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-05 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 389 |
2014-04-07 | House | Returned Passed |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Hearing 3/19 at 1:45 p.m. |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-10 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2014-03-07 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2014-03-05 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments {745264/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2014-02-04 | House | Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-16 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |