MD HB183 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-28 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-28 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the definition of a "local government" under the Local Government Tort Claims Act to include the nonprofit corporation serving as the industrial development authority in Carroll County; providing that a specified notice requirement does not apply to specified actions against a specified nonprofit corporation in Carroll County or its employees; providing for the prospective application of the Act; etc.
Title
Carroll County - Local Government Tort Claims Act - Industrial Development Authority
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (129-1) (Y: 129 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-28 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2014-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2014-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (129-1) |
2014-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments {532212/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2014-01-29 | House | Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-15 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Carroll County
Civil Actions
Civil Actions and Procedures
Corporations
Counties - Local Laws
Industry and Technology
Liability
Nonprofit Organizations
Sovereign Immunity
Torts
Civil Actions
Civil Actions and Procedures
Corporations
Counties - Local Laws
Industry and Technology
Liability
Nonprofit Organizations
Sovereign Immunity
Torts