MD HB180 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 126
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 126
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Dorchester County Sanitary Commission to request the county tax collector to conduct a sale of real property to enforce a lien representing any unpaid benefit assessment or other specified charges, in accordance with the same procedures governing the sale of property for delinquent property taxes; and authorizing the tax collector in Dorchester County to conduct a county tax sale for the purpose of enforcing a specified lien.
Title
Dorchester County Sanitary Commission - Enforcement of Liens - Tax Sale Authorization
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-23 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (131-3) (Y: 131 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (131-3) (Y: 131 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-14 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 126 |
2014-04-02 | House | Returned Passed |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2014-03-14 | House | Third Reading Passed (131-3) |
2014-03-13 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2014-03-13 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-13 | House | Favorable Report by Environmental Matters |
2014-03-07 | House | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-15 | House | First Reading Environmental Matters |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Counties - Generally
Dorchester County
Environment
Liens
Real Property
Sanitary Districts
Tax Sales
Utilities
Counties - Generally
Dorchester County
Environment
Liens
Real Property
Sanitary Districts
Tax Sales
Utilities