MD HB18 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-05 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 270
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-05 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 270
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring public senior higher education institutions and community colleges in the State to provide specified information on the cost of higher education at the institution to all first-time, full-time undergraduate freshmen beginning in the 2014-2015 academic year.
Title
Institutions of Higher Education - Student Notification - Financial Information
Sponsors
Del. Dana Stein [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (119-0) (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (119-0) (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-05 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 270 |
2014-04-03 | House | Returned Passed |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-02-14 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-02-13 | House | Third Reading Passed (119-0) |
2014-02-11 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-02-11 | House | Favorable with Amendments {924066/1 Report Adopted |
2014-02-10 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2014-01-28 | House | Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-08 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
2013-11-13 | House | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Community Colleges
Electronic Government
Forms
Higher Education
Notices
Postal Service
Prices
State Universities and Colleges
Students
Tuition
Electronic Government
Forms
Higher Education
Notices
Postal Service
Prices
State Universities and Colleges
Students
Tuition