MD HB1533 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-25 - Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-25 - Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Commission on Child Custody Decision Making to submit an additional interim report of its findings and recommendations on or before December 31, 2014, and a final report of its findings and recommendations December 1, 2015, respectively; extending the termination date of the Commission from December 31, 2014, to December 31, 2015.
Title
Commission on Child Custody Decision Making - Extension
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-25 | Senate | Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2014-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2014-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments {932310/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2014-03-13 | House | Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-10 | House | Rereferred to Judiciary |
2014-03-03 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |