MD HB1526 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing, for specified qualified spouses and qualified working taxpayers, the amount of the State earned income tax credit; reducing the State earned income tax credit for specified taxpayers; providing that individuals filing a joint income tax return may make a specified calculation without regard to specified income; providing that specified individuals with specified income in excess of 200% of the federal poverty income guidelines may not claim the credit; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2013; etc.
Title
Earned Income Tax Credit - Calculation and Eligibility
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | House | Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-10 | House | Rereferred to Ways and Means |
2014-03-03 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |