MD HB1522 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-05 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 461
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-05 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 461
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Creating an exception to a specified statement of need requirement for the temporary relocation of an existing licensed residential child care program if the temporary site meets the requirements of the residential child care program's license and other specified circumstances; etc.
Title
Residential Child Care Programs - Statement of Need - Exception for Temporary Relocation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-22 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-22 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-05 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 461 |
2014-04-07 | House | Returned Passed |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-03-28 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2014-03-27 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2014-03-26 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-26 | House | Favorable with Amendments {806286/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-26 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2014-03-20 | House | Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-10 | House | Rereferred to Health and Government Operations |
2014-03-03 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Subjects
Child Care
Children
Community Facilities and Services
Juvenile Facilities
Licenses
Social Services - Generally
Children
Community Facilities and Services
Juvenile Facilities
Licenses
Social Services - Generally