MD HB1432 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Status: Enrolled on April 7 2014 - 75% progress
Action: 2014-04-07 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Renaming the Maryland Teacher Scholarship to be the Teaching Fellows for Maryland scholarship and altering specified elements of the scholarship program; requiring specified institutions of higher education to provide matching funds to participate in a specified program; altering the eligibility criteria and service obligation associated with the scholarship; altering the amount of the award for a scholarship to be 100% of the annual tuition, mandatory fees, and room and board at specified institutions; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Teaching Fellows for Maryland Scholarship Program

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-03-31 - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-29 - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-07HouseReturned Passed
2014-04-07SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2014-04-07SenateSecond Reading Passed
2014-04-07SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2014-04-07SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2014-04-07SenateRereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2014-04-07SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules
2014-04-05HouseThird Reading Passed (135-0)
2014-04-04HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2014-04-04HouseFavorable with Amendments {275164/1 Report Adopted
2014-04-04HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2014-03-12HouseHearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
2014-02-24HouseRereferred to Ways and Means
2014-02-14HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback