MD HB1417 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 251
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 251
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering provisions that apply to the work sharing unemployment insurance program; requiring that a decision by the Secretary of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation to disapprove a work sharing plan identify the reasons for disapproval; altering requirements for a work sharing plan; prohibiting the Secretary from approving specified work sharing plans; altering eligibility criteria for specified employees; altering the computation of work sharing benefits; altering benefit charging provisions for specified employing units; etc.
Title
Unemployment Insurance - Work Sharing
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (42-5) (Y: 42 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (101-35) (Y: 101 N: 35 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (101-35) (Y: 101 N: 35 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-14 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 251 |
2014-04-03 | House | Returned Passed |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (42-5) |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2014-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (101-35) |
2014-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments {313595/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2014-03-07 | House | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-25 | House | Rereferred to Economic Matters |
2014-02-13 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Subjects
Appeals
Disclosure
Federal Government
Health Insurance
Job Training
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Leave
Notices
Records
Retirement Systems
Unemployment
Unemployment Insurance
Work, Labor and Employment
Disclosure
Federal Government
Health Insurance
Job Training
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Leave
Notices
Records
Retirement Systems
Unemployment
Unemployment Insurance
Work, Labor and Employment