MD HB1415 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-05 - Assigned a chapter number, enactment subject to constitutional referendum - Chapter 261
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-05 - Assigned a chapter number, enactment subject to constitutional referendum - Chapter 261
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Proposing an amendment to the Maryland Constitution to provide that a county charter may provide for the filling of a vacancy in the office of chief executive officer or county executive of a county by special election; submitting an amendment to the Maryland Constitution to the qualified voters of the State for their adoption or rejection; authorizing a special election to fill a vacancy in the office of chief executive officer or county executive of a charter county to be conducted by mail; etc.
Title
Chief Executive Officer or County Executive - Special Election to Fill a Vacancy in Office
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (129-6) (Y: 129 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (115-21) (Y: 115 N: 21 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (115-21) (Y: 115 N: 21 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-05 | House | Assigned a chapter number, enactment subject to constitutional referendum - Chapter 261 |
2014-04-04 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2014-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (129-6) |
2014-04-04 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {204630/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (115-21) |
2014-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-14 | House | Special Order until 3/15 (Delegate Eckardt) Adopted |
2014-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments {505469/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2014-03-06 | House | Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-24 | House | Rereferred to Ways and Means |
2014-02-13 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Subjects
Chartered Counties
Constitutional Amendments
Counties - Local Laws
County Executives
Elections
Postal Service
Public Officials
Referendum
Sunset
Constitutional Amendments
Counties - Local Laws
County Executives
Elections
Postal Service
Public Officials
Referendum
Sunset