MD HB1406 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 655
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 655
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring each local board of elections to maintain voting authority cards that have been signed under a specified provision of law for 3 years by physically storing the voting authority cards, or electronically scanning and storing the voting authority cards in the same manner that the local board stores other electronic materials.
Title
Election Law - Signed Voting Authority Cards - Maintenance
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (130-1) (Y: 130 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (130-1) (Y: 130 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 655 |
2014-04-07 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2014-04-07 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2014-04-07 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {854537/1 Report Adopted |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-03-15 | House | Third Reading Passed (130-1) |
2014-03-14 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments {785863/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2014-03-06 | House | Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-24 | House | Rereferred to Ways and Means |
2014-02-13 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |