MD HB1395 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Status: Introduced on February 24 2012 - 25% progress, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-09 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing the creation of a State Debt not to exceed $23,000, the proceeds to be used as a grant to the Board of Directors of the Deale Elementary School Parent Teacher Association (Technology Committee) for the design, construction, repair, and renovation of the Deale Elementary School Technology Enhancement Project; providing for disbursement of the loan proceeds, subject to a requirement that the grantee provide and expend a matching fund; establishing a deadline for the encumbrance or expenditure of the loan proceeds; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Deale Elementary School

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-04-09 Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
2012-02-29 Hearing 3/10 at 12:00 p.m.
2012-02-27 Re-referred Appropriations
2012-02-24 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback