MD HB137 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-05 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 387
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-05 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 387
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing in Montgomery County a beauty salon beer and wine license; requiring that a recipient of the license be a holder of a beauty salon permit; authorizing a holder of the license to provide beer and wine by the glass for consumption by a customer receiving cosmetology services or when a fundraising event is held; etc.
Title
Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Beauty Salon License MC 9-14
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-30 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (125-2) (Y: 125 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2014-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (126-8) (Y: 126 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (126-8) (Y: 126 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-05 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 387 |
2014-04-05 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2014-04-05 | House | Third Reading Passed (125-2) |
2014-04-05 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2014-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {994835/1 Report Adopted |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-03-14 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-03-13 | House | Third Reading Passed (126-8) |
2014-03-12 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-12 | House | Favorable with Amendments {753193/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-12 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2014-02-17 | House | Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-13 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Cosmetologists
Education
Fees
License Commissioners, Boards of
Montgomery County
St. Mary's County
Substance Abuse
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Cosmetologists
Education
Fees
License Commissioners, Boards of
Montgomery County
St. Mary's County
Substance Abuse