MD HB1349 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 40-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 249
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 40-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 249
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of State Police, when it advertises for or recruits new employees, to include advertising that is targeted toward underrepresented communities and individuals; requiring the Department to report to specified committees of the General Assembly on or before December 1 of each year on initiatives the Department has employed to improve diversity in recruitment and the outcome of those initiatives; etc.
Title
Public Safety Diversity Act of 2014
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (40-6) (Y: 40 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (111-24) (Y: 111 N: 24 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (111-24) (Y: 111 N: 24 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-14 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 249 |
2014-04-07 | House | Returned Passed |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (40-6) |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance) |
2014-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2014-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (111-24) |
2014-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments {646387/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2014-02-26 | House | Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations) |
2014-02-19 | House | Hearing cancelled (Health and Government Operations) |
2014-02-28 | House | Hearing 2/28 at 12:30 p.m. (Health and Government Operations) |
2014-02-07 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations and Appropriations |
Subjects
Advertising
Committees and Commissions
Discipline
Discrimination
Ethnic Affairs
Hearings
Law Enforcement
Minorities
News Media
Public Safety
Radio
Reports
Rules and Regulations
State Employees
State Police, Department of
Sunset
Women
Work, Labor and Employment
Committees and Commissions
Discipline
Discrimination
Ethnic Affairs
Hearings
Law Enforcement
Minorities
News Media
Public Safety
Radio
Reports
Rules and Regulations
State Employees
State Police, Department of
Sunset
Women
Work, Labor and Employment