MD HB1343 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 30-19)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-31 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-31 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to establish a specified opioids time lock dispenser pilot program; requiring the Secretary to adopt specified regulations to carry out the pilot program; prohibiting the Secretary from requiring that a veteran pay a fee in order to get a time lock dispenser; requiring the Secretary annually to submit a report to the Governor and the General Assembly on the progress of the pilot program; and terminating the Act after September 30, 2018.
Title
Department of Veterans Affairs - Opioids Time Lock Dispenser Pilot Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-31 | House | Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2014-03-06 | House | Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-07 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Equipment
Fees
Reports
Rules and Regulations
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Substance Abuse
Sunset
Veterans
Veterans Affairs, Department of
Equipment
Fees
Reports
Rules and Regulations
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Substance Abuse
Sunset
Veterans
Veterans Affairs, Department of