MD HB1323 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 62-9)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-07 - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-07 - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Interagency Committee on School Construction to conduct a specified study and make specified recommendations regarding the development of specified alternative financing methods; requiring the Committee to solicit input from specified entities; requiring the Committee to submit an interim report on or before December 1, 2014, and a final report on or before September 1, 2015; etc.
Title
Public School Construction - Creative Financing Study
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-07 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Floor Amendment (Senator Hershey) {623027/1 Withdrawn |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Floor Amendment (Senator Kelley) {393625/1 Rejected |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Special Order until later today (Senator DeGrange) Adopted |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Floor Amendment (Senator Kelley) {393625/1 |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {959335/1 Report Adopted |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Special Order until later today (Senator Middleton) Adopted |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {959335/1 |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2014-04-05 | Senate | Rereferred to Budget and Taxation |
2014-04-05 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2014-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2014-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-04-03 | House | Favorable with Amendments {374469/1 Report Adopted |
2014-04-03 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2014-03-06 | House | Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-07 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Appropriations
Budget and Management, Department of
Committees and Commissions
Comptroller
Construction
Counties
County and Baltimore City Bonds
Education - Local Bills
Interest
Lottery
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
State Aid
Budget and Management, Department of
Committees and Commissions
Comptroller
Construction
Counties
County and Baltimore City Bonds
Education - Local Bills
Interest
Lottery
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
State Aid