MD HB1321 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 56-5)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-24 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-24 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expanding the scope of authority and the duties of the Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Marijuana Commission relating to the treatment of patients qualified to use medical marijuana; authorizing the Commission to set fees; providing that the fees are part of a specified fund; encouraging the Commission to approve specified applications; authorizing the Commission to approve specified applications; requiring the Commission to make an annual report regarding specified medical marijuana treatment centers; etc.
Title
Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Marijuana Commission - Treatment, Certification, Licensing, and Registration
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-24 | House | Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn |
2014-02-28 | House | Hearing 2/28 at 12:30 p.m. |
2014-02-26 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2014-02-28 | House | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-19 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2014-03-11 | House | Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-07 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Agriculture
Child Custody
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Background Investigations
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Discipline
Disclosure
Discrimination
Diseases
Drugs
Fees
Food
Health
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Health Care Facilities
Health Occupations
Hearings
Higher Education
Laboratories
Landlord and Tenant
Liability
Licenses
Medical Research
Notices
Patients
Penalties and Sentences
Petitions
Physicians
Privacy
Public Health
Public Information
Records
Registration
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Work, Labor and Employment
Child Custody
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Background Investigations
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Discipline
Disclosure
Discrimination
Diseases
Drugs
Fees
Food
Health
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Health Care Facilities
Health Occupations
Hearings
Higher Education
Laboratories
Landlord and Tenant
Liability
Licenses
Medical Research
Notices
Patients
Penalties and Sentences
Petitions
Physicians
Privacy
Public Health
Public Information
Records
Registration
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Work, Labor and Employment