MD HB1317 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 652
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 652
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Maryland Technology Internship Program; establishing the purposes of the Program; requiring the University of Maryland, Baltimore County (UMBC) to administer the Program and undertake specified activities to carry out the purposes of the Program; establishing specified eligibility requirements for participation in the Program; requiring UMBC to prepare a specified annual report; requiring the Governor to include funds in the State budget for reimbursement of intern stipends and other specified purposes; etc.
Title
Higher Education - Maryland Technology Internship Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-03 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-09 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (129-7) (Y: 129 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-09 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (129-7) (Y: 129 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 652 |
2014-04-07 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2014-04-07 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2014-04-07 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {174333/1 Report Adopted |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-03-12 | House | Third Reading Passed (129-7) |
2014-03-11 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-11 | House | Favorable with Amendments {894469/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-10 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2014-03-04 | House | Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-07 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Appropriations
Economic and Community Development
Electronic Government
Higher Education
Industry and Technology
Registration
Reports
Salaries and Compensation
Small Business
State Universities and Colleges
Students
Veterans
Work, Labor and Employment
Economic and Community Development
Electronic Government
Higher Education
Industry and Technology
Registration
Reports
Salaries and Compensation
Small Business
State Universities and Colleges
Students
Veterans
Work, Labor and Employment