MD HB1215 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-05 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 340
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-05 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 340
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Renaming the Community College Transfer Scholarship to be the 2+2 Transfer Scholarship and altering specified elements of the Program; altering the qualifications for the scholarship and the annual amount of the award; specifying that the scholarship may be used for 3 years, or six semesters, whichever is longer; requiring at least $2,000,000 to be transferred from the Need-Based Student Financial Assistance Fund under specified circumstances; etc.
Title
Higher Education - 2+2 Transfer Scholarship
Sponsors
Del. John Bohanan [D] | Del. Kumar Barve [D] | Del. Anne Healey [D] | Del. Sheila Hixson [D] |
Del. Sally Jameson [D] | Del. Anne Kaiser [D] | Del. Peter Murphy [D] | Del. C.T. Wilson [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (130-0) (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (130-0) (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-05 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 340 |
2014-04-04 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2014-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2014-04-04 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {254436/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-03-15 | House | Third Reading Passed (130-0) |
2014-03-14 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments {835263/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2014-03-05 | House | Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-07 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Appropriations
Armed Forces
Community Colleges
Higher Education
Names
Nonprofit Organizations
Private Schools
Registration
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
State Universities and Colleges
Students
Work, Labor and Employment
Armed Forces
Community Colleges
Higher Education
Names
Nonprofit Organizations
Private Schools
Registration
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
State Universities and Colleges
Students
Work, Labor and Employment