MD HB12 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-05 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 379
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-05 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 379
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing specified fee revenue collected for the Bay Restoration Fund to be used by specified local public entities to implement regulations for on-site sewage disposal systems that utilize the best available technology for the removal of nitrogen.
Title
Bay Restoration Fund - Authorized Uses - Local Entities
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-20 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-0) (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-0) (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-05 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 379 |
2014-03-27 | House | Returned Passed |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-21 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-02-20 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2014-02-18 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2014-02-18 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-02-17 | House | Favorable Report by Environmental Matters |
2014-01-29 | House | Hearing 1/29 at 2:00 p.m. |
2014-01-15 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2014-01-29 | House | Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-08 | House | First Reading Environmental Matters |
2013-10-29 | House | Pre-filed |