MD HB1124 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-2)
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 199
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-2)
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 199
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the list of entities and individuals to which specified provisions relating to dangerous or wild animals, including a prohibition on importing, offering for sale, trading, bartering, possessing, breeding, or exchanging specified animals, do not apply; authorizing holders of a specified federal exhibitor's license to possess or breed specified animals if specified conditions are met; requiring a local animal control authority to take specified steps to find long-term placement of specified seized animals; etc.
Title
Criminal Law - Possession of Dangerous or Wild Animals
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-14 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 199 |
2014-04-05 | House | Returned Passed |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2014-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2014-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2014-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-15 | House | Special Order until next session (Delegate Eckardt) Adopted |
2014-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments {320418/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters |
2014-02-26 | House | Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-07 | House | First Reading Environmental Matters |
Subjects
Animals
Art, Music and Cultural Affairs
Commerce and Business
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Diseases
Federal Government
Insurance
Job Training
Liability
Licenses
Rabies
Reports
Search and Seizure
Work, Labor and Employment
Art, Music and Cultural Affairs
Commerce and Business
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Diseases
Federal Government
Insurance
Job Training
Liability
Licenses
Rabies
Reports
Search and Seizure
Work, Labor and Employment