MD HB1100 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-07 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-07 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amending the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2007 to provide that a specified grant for the SMARTCO's Computer Technology Learning Center may not terminate before June 1, 2015; etc.
Title
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2007 - St. Mary's County - SMARTCO's Computer Technology Learning Center
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-07 | House | Unfavorable Report by Appropriations |
2014-03-06 | House | Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-07 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Community Facilities and Services
Education
Prior Authorizations
St. Mary's County
State Bonds
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Education
Prior Authorizations
St. Mary's County
State Bonds
Telecommunications and Information Technology