MD HB1075 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 639
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 639
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Defining the terms "apartment unit" and "property" for purposes of law relating to system development charges imposed by the Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission; and altering the definition of "new service" to include a direct connection of an improvement or building and a connection through an existing on-site system.
Title
Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - System Development Charge - Definitions PG/MC 106-14
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 639 |
2014-04-05 | House | Returned Passed |
2014-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2014-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments {730116/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters |
2014-03-14 | House | Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-06 | House | First Reading Environmental Matters |
Subjects
Apartments
Committees and Commissions
Fees
Sewage
Utilities
Utility Regulation
Washington Suburban Sanitary District
Water
Committees and Commissions
Fees
Sewage
Utilities
Utility Regulation
Washington Suburban Sanitary District
Water