MD HB1024 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 470
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 470
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Extending to fiscal year 2030 the fiscal year through which the Governor is authorized to include an appropriation in the budget bill for the Rural Maryland Prosperity Investment Fund; altering the manner in which disbursements of money appropriated to the Fund are required to be made; requiring that any money received by a regional council under a specified provision of law be used for a specified purpose; extending the termination date of the Fund to June 30, 2030; etc.
Title
Rural Maryland Prosperity Investment Fund - Revisions and Extension of Termination Date
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 470 |
2014-04-03 | House | Returned Passed |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-03-07 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-03-06 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2014-03-03 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2014-03-03 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-03 | House | Favorable Report by Environmental Matters |
2014-02-19 | House | Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-06 | House | First Reading Environmental Matters |
Subjects
Agriculture
Appropriations
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Community Development
Eastern Shore
Economic and Community Development
Grants
Health
Revenue and Taxes
Sunset
Tri-County Council
Appropriations
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Community Development
Eastern Shore
Economic and Community Development
Grants
Health
Revenue and Taxes
Sunset
Tri-County Council