MD HB1021 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-07 - First Reading Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-07 - First Reading Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Housing and Community Development and the Commissioner of Financial Regulation to conduct specified analyses based on the available data of specified foreclosure trends for residential real property in Prince George's County; requiring the Department and the Commissioner to report the Department's and the Commissioner's findings to specified committees and specified delegations of the General Assembly on or before December 31, 2014; etc.
Title
Prince George's County - Foreclosure - Report by Department of Housing and Community Development and Commissioner of Financial Regulation PG 411-14
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-1) (Y: 134 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-07 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2014-04-07 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-1) |
2014-04-07 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-04-07 | House | Favorable with Amendments {690514/2 Report Adopted |
2014-04-07 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters |
2014-04-01 | House | Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-06 | House | First Reading Environmental Matters |
Subjects
Civil Actions
Civil Actions and Procedures
Consumer Protection
Damages
Emergency Bills
Financial Institutions
Foreclosure
Housing
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Liability
Mortgages
Prince George's County
Real Property
Reports
Sunset
Civil Actions and Procedures
Consumer Protection
Damages
Emergency Bills
Financial Institutions
Foreclosure
Housing
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Liability
Mortgages
Prince George's County
Real Property
Reports
Sunset