MD HB10 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-10 - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-10 - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creating the State Board of Common Ownership Community Managers in the Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation; providing for the composition of the Board and the appointment, terms, and expenses of the Board members; providing that the Act does not prohibit specified persons from providing services under specified circumstances; requiring an individual to be issued a license by the Board before providing management services for a common ownership community under specified circumstances; etc.
Title
Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community Managers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-10 | House | Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn |
2014-01-30 | House | Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-08 | House | First Reading Environmental Matters |
2013-09-19 | House | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Auditors and Audits
Banks and Trust Companies
Bonds
Budget and Management, Department of
Business Regulation and Occupations
Committees and Commissions
Condominiums
Contracts
Cooperative Associations
Crimes and Punishments
Discipline
Education
Examinations
Fees
Fines
Fraud
Hearings
Homeowners Associations
Housing
Insurance
Interstate Affairs
Job Training
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Licenses
Negligence
Notices
Oaths
Penalties and Sentences
Public Information
Publications
Real Property
Records
Registration
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Subpoenas
Sunset
Work, Labor and Employment
Banks and Trust Companies
Bonds
Budget and Management, Department of
Business Regulation and Occupations
Committees and Commissions
Condominiums
Contracts
Cooperative Associations
Crimes and Punishments
Discipline
Education
Examinations
Fees
Fines
Fraud
Hearings
Homeowners Associations
Housing
Insurance
Interstate Affairs
Job Training
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Licenses
Negligence
Notices
Oaths
Penalties and Sentences
Public Information
Publications
Real Property
Records
Registration
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Subpoenas
Sunset
Work, Labor and Employment