MA S223 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-06 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-06 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the quality in early education care centers. Education.
Title
Improving quality in early education care centers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-06 | Senate | No further action taken |
2015-01-06 | Senate | Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2014-04-03 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday, June 30, 2014, pending concurrence |
2013-12-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/25/2013 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2013-03-18 | House | House concurred |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Discharged to the Senate Committee on Public Service |
2013-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Senate Committee on Education |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S223 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S223.pdf |