MA S2177 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on December 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-19 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 398 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on December 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-19 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 398 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to increase the number of all alcohol licenses for restaurants in the town of Arlington. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
To increase the number of all alcohol licenses for restaurants in the town of Arlington
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-19 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 398 of the Acts of 2014 | |
2014-12-15 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2014-12-15 | House | Enacted |
2014-12-11 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2014-10-02 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2014-10-02 | House | Rules suspended |
2014-10-02 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2014-09-29 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2014-09-25 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2014-09-25 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2014-07-01 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2014-06-19 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2014-06-17 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/17/2014 from 03:30 PM-04:00 PM in A-2 |
2014-06-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/17/2014 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-2 |
2014-06-10 | House | House concurred |
2014-06-09 | Senate | Referred to the Senate Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S2177 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S2177.pdf |