MA S1911 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2080
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Introduced on October 31 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2080
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 31 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2080
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a commission on the status of children and youth. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.
Title
Establishing a commission on the status of children and youth
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-10 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2080 |
2014-01-24 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/28/2014 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in 437 |
2013-11-06 | House | House concurred |
2013-10-31 | Senate | Referred to the Senate Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
2013-10-31 | Senate | Rules suspended |
Same As/Similar To
S2080 (Replaced by) 2014-11-24 - New draft substituted, see S2398
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S1911 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S1911.pdf |