MA H933 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H996
Note: Legislation replaced by H4234
Note: Legislation replaced by H4234
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-3)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4234
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4234
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relativerelative to health insurance for human service providers and their employees. Financial Services.
Title
Relative to access to health insurance for human service providers and their employees
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-30 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4234 |
2013-12-12 | House | Reported favorably by committee and referred to the House Committee on Health Care Financing |
2013-12-12 | House | Accompanied by H996 |
2013-04-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/11/2013 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
H996 (Replaces) 2013-12-12 - Accompanied H933
H4234 (Replaced by) 2014-07-09 - Reported, in part, by H369
H4234 (Replaced by) 2014-07-09 - Reported, in part, by H369
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H933 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H933.pdf |