MA H913 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4039
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4039
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4039
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relativerelative to the cash deposit required in lieu of liability bond or insurance upon application for motor vehicle registration or renewal. Financial Services.
Title
Relative to compulsory motor vehicle liability insurance
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-15 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4039 |
2013-09-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/20/2013 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
H4039 (Replaced by) 2014-04-15 - Reported, in part, by H2861
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H913 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H913.pdf |