MA H59 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court

Note: Legislation has been replaced by H4500

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Introduced on February 14 2013 - 25% progress
Action: 2014-09-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4500
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to providing retiree healthcare benefits reform. Public Service. February 12, 2013.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing retiree healthcare benefits reform

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

History

DateChamberAction
2014-09-29HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4500
2014-07-08SenateSenate concurred
2014-07-07HouseReporting date extended to Thursday, July 31, 2014, pending concurrence
2014-04-10SenateSenate concurred
2014-04-03HouseReporting date extended to Monday, June 30, 2014, pending concurrence
2014-02-18JointHearing scheduled for 10/31/2013 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
2013-02-19SenateSenate concurred
2013-02-14HouseReferred to the House Committee on Public Service

Same As/Similar To

H4500 (Replaced by) 2014-09-29 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback