MA H3748 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4233
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on August 12 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4233
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 12 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4233
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to increasing the fine for harming police dogs or horses. The Judiciary.
Title
To increase the fine for harming a police dog or horse
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Heroux [D] | Rep. Christine Canavan [D] | Rep. James Cantwell [D] | Rep. James Dwyer [D] |
Rep. Sean Garballey [D] | Rep. Aaron Vega [D] | Sen. Peter Durant [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-30 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4233 |
2014-04-17 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/24/2014 from 01:30 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2014-03-20 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday June 30, 2014, pending concurrence |
2013-11-07 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-11-06 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary |
2013-08-12 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H4233 (Replaced by) 2014-06-30 - Reported, in part, by H1182
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H3748 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H3748.pdf |