MA H3525 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-11)
Status: Passed on August 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 274 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-11)
Status: Passed on August 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 274 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the term of appointment of non-civil service police officers. Public Service.
Title
Clarifying the term of appointment of non-civil service police officers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-08 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 274 of the Acts of 2014 | |
2014-07-31 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2014-07-31 | House | Enacted |
2014-07-31 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2014-07-31 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2014-07-31 | Senate | Committee recommended that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2014-07-28 | Senate | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ethics and Rules |
2014-07-24 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2014-03-05 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2014-03-03 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2014-02-18 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2014-02-18 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/21/2014 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-06-19 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the House Committee on Public Service |
2013-03-14 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H3525 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H3525.pdf |