MA H344 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4012
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 43-3)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to addressing the needs of students with autism. Education.
Title
To increase capacity to address the complex needs of students with autism
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-03 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4012 |
2013-09-09 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/19/2013 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
H4012 (Replaced by) 2015-01-06 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H344 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H344.pdf |