MA H3426 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-22 - Motion to reconsider negatived
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-22 - Motion to reconsider negatived
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relativerelative to qualified placement agencies of adult foster care providers. Health Care Financing.
Title
Relative to adult foster care
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-22 | House | Motion to reconsider negatived |
2014-04-22 | House | Bill rejected |
2014-04-22 | House | Bills in the Third Reading discharge report accepted |
2014-04-22 | House | Read third |
2013-10-30 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2013-10-28 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2013-10-15 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2013-04-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/30/2013 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Health Care Financing |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H3426 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H3426.pdf |